+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 449, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6039.).
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4410.).
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4470.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 11).
On January 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 14, 2014: AB 1511 GAINES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 11, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1511 Beth Gaines By Leno
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 10, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2014: AB 1511 GAINES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 11, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor