+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On May 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On January 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 14.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor