+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1895.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: AB 1501 Low Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 14
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Low
Type:
Primary Sponsor