+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
On January 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
May 21, 2014: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor