+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 474, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3008.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2581.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set first hearing. Held in committee. Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1435.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
On December 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (11)
September 9, 2015: AB 15 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB15 Holden By Jackson
- Yeas: 40
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2015: [07-07-2015] set for [First] hearing: Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 7, 2015: [07-07-2015] set for [First] hearing: Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 14, 2015: AB 15 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor