+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 604, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 3070.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2643.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1).
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1792.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: AB 1496 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1496 Thurmond By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 1496 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor