+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6119.).
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 6114.)
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1).
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 14, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3308.)
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member McCarty.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
August 24, 2022: AB 1491 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB1491
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 1, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
January 14, 2022: AB 1491 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 13
May 12, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor