+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2980.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2528.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6).
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1582.)
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 6).
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
September 9, 2021: AB 1487 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 4
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Gabriel et al. By Allen
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
July 6, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
May 27, 2021: AB 1487 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor