+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 3440.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2732.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2608.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9).
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 2128.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1725.)
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 8).
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 11, 2019: AB 1482 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 5
September 10, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1482 Chiu et al. By Atkins
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 19, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
July 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 29, 2019: AB 1482 Chiu Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 6
May 8, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
April 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor