+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on third reading file.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5079.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Without reference to committee.
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2014: AB 1481 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor