+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 718, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3036.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2506.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1154.)
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 24).
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 9, 2021: AB 1476 Gray Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1476 Gray By Dodd
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 8, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
April 22, 2021: AB 1476 Gray Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Gray
Type:
Primary Sponsor