+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 12, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 11, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
On February 18, 2023 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2023: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor