+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett.
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 15).
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.)
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5076.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- Without reference to committee.
On January 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: AB 1474 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor