+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3073.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2568.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 1895.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: AB 1466 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
September 9, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1466 McCarty et al. By Rubio
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2021: AB 1466 McCarty Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 20
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor