+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3473.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 11).
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.)
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.)
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2707.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 12, 2019: AB 1454 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 11, 2019: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
September 9, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1454 Jones-Sawyer By Dahle
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 9, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2019: AB 1454 Jones-Sawyer Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor