+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2121.).
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 20, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1453 Eduardo Garcia By Stone
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 18, 2017: AB 1453 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 19, 2017: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor