+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2936.).
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2307.).
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 22. Page 1307.)
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 26).
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 5, 2017: AB 1452 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1452 Muratsuchi By Allen
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
May 1, 2017: AB 1452 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor