+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6737.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6736.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6736.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4991.).
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.)
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1,
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4905.)
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4284.)
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26).
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 8.
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 29, 2014: AB 1450 GARCIA Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 29, 2014: Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB1450 Garcia By Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 6, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 1, 2014: AB 1450 GARCIA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
March 26, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor