+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 358, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2808.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.)
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2331.).
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 856.).
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On January 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
On January 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 2, 2015: AB 145 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB145 Gomez By Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB145 Gomez By Hernandez Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 9, 2015: AB 145 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2015: AB 145 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
March 18, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor