+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 676, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 3250.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2714.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 33. Page 2069.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.)
On May 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 17).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 13, 2017: AB 1448 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1448 Weber By Skinner
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 6
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2017: AB 1448 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 6
May 17, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor