+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6241.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.)
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4616.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 5021.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On February 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 20, 2014: AB 1447 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1447 Waldron By Hill
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 14, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 10, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2014: AB 1447 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
May 7, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 16
April 7, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation.
- Yeas: 9