+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4607.).
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 4704.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 9).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 19, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1446 Mullin By Padilla
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2014: AB 1446 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 6
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor