+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On January 17, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
March 26, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor