+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee September 29.
On August 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsors (5)
Committee on Agriculture
Type:
Primary Sponsor