+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
August 23, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 27, 2021: AB 1429 Holden Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor