+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 66, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2454.).
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2019: AB 1429 Chen Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
June 17, 2019: Consent Calendar AB1429
- Yeas: 40
June 5, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2019: AB 1429 Chen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 9, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor