+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 526, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6884.).
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 28).
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5661.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5602.)
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5601.).
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2018: AB 1423 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 28, 2018: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 10
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1423 Chiu By Wiener
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1423 Chiu By Wiener Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 18, 2017: AB 1423 CHIU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
May 10, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 26, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor