+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2678.).
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2199.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1817.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and TRANS.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (13)
August 31, 2015: AB 1422 COOPER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1422 Cooper By Allen
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: AB 1422 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: AB 1422 COOPER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 16
April 20, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor