+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2019: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor