+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2664.).
On August 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1883.).
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1579.)
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On March 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2013: AB 1421 A & A.R. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
August 19, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1421 Committee on ACC. & ADM. REV. (Fr By Wright
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2013: AB 1421 A & A.R. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
May 1, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review
Type:
Primary Sponsor