+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor