+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 239, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2800.).
On August 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2200.).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1479.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 22, 2019: AB 1414 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 19, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1414 Friedman By Hertzberg
- Yeas: 40
June 11, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2019: AB 1414 Friedman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor