+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3287.).
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2354.).
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1828.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 19.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 12, 2013: AB 1412 BOCANEGRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2013: W/O REF. TO FILE AB1412 Bocanegra By Lieu
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
July 3, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 30, 2013: AB 1412 REV. & TAX. Assembly Third Reading By BOCANEGRA
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1