+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3101.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2474.).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 1533.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 11, 2017: AB 1411 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
September 5, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1411 Cristina Garcia By Mendoza
- Yeas: 40
July 19, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 15, 2017: AB 1411 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor