+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 530, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2834.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2372.).
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 1883.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 1411 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1411 Eduardo Garcia By McGuire
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1411 Eduardo Garcia By McGuire
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
June 3, 2015: AB 1411 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 4
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor