+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2097.).
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1479.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 13.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1410 Committee on V. A. (Muratsuchi) By Roth
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
May 16, 2013: AB 1410 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 9
May 8, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 30, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Committee on Veterans Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor