+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 445, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2657.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 2222.).
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 1547.)
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
On February 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 1, 2021: AB 1407 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 11
August 30, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1407 Burke et al. By Bradford
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
July 14, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2021: AB 1407 Burke Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 12
May 19, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
April 6, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health]
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor