+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bradford.
- From consent calendar.
On May 8, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 13.
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (7)
Committee on Utilities and Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor