+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 2362.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2356.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1975.).
- Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1962.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On July 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.)
On June 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.)
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 481.)
On February 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.)
- Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On January 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
July 15, 2021: AB 140 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
July 15, 2021: Assembly 2nd Reading AB140 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 14, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2021: AB 140 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor