+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 6