+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 375, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 3513.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2955.).
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 17).
On July 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1887.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1718.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1005.)
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 15, 2017: AB 1397 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
September 15, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1397 Low et al. By Wiener
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 31, 2017: AB 1397 LOW Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
May 24, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
April 19, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2