+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2. Page 3478.)
On January 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 21).
On January 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On December 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 14, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: AB 1395 SALAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
January 21, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor