+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
January 9, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor