+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 152, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5799.).
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4195.).
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
On June 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On March 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 3, 2014: AB 1393 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 30, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1393 Perea By Evans Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 12, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: AB 1393 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 10, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13