+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3240.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2522.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1888.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2019: AB 1391 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1391 Bonta By Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 23, 2019: AB 1391 Bonta Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 10, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor