+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 2004.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25).
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
May 31, 2017: AB 1380 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 11
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor