+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX.
On January 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On December 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Vote
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor