+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 529, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2616.).
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2150.).
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1226.)
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
August 27, 2015: AB 1374 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1374 Levine By Bates
- Yeas: 40
June 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
June 8, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
April 30, 2015: AB 1374 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2015: AB 1374 LEVINE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
April 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor