+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 853, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 6337.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 5293.).
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5293.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lara.
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 5292.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 6. Page 1624.)
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 13).
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On March 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: AB 1373 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 Santiago By Lara
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB1373 Santiago By Lara Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: AB 1373 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
May 13, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor