+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1478.)
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
On April 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2019: AB 1372 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 24, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 2, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor